Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marius Antonini

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Albano

Titular Bishop of Neocaesarea in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1567¹Born
29 Nov 162760.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Albano, Italy
29 Nov 162760.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Neocaesarea in Bithynia
21 Dec 162760.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Neocaesarea in Bithynia
22 Jun 163366.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Albano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marius Antonini:
Bishop Marius Antonini (born 1567, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Albano

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 256
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 90, Number 536
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015