Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wolfgang von Closen

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1503¹Born
20 Dec 155552.9SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
12 Jun 155653.4ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
11 Oct 155653.7Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
7 Aug 156158.5DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wolfgang von Closen (VIAF: 50011923)
Bishop Wolfgang von Closen (born 1503, died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHaidenburg
Ordained BishopPassau, Diocese of Passau

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 271
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1556, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 12 Oct 2017