Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theobald Craschel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1511Born
5 May 157463.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
5 May 157463.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
8 Sep 157463.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
31 Jul 158776.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Theobald Craschel (VIAF: 13043693)
Bishop Theobald Craschel (born 1511, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAachen
Ordained BishopKöln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 184
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Jun 2018

Quantcast