Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcin Kromer

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1512Born
1542¹29.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jun 157057.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
5 Aug 157966.7SucceededBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
6 Dec 157967.0Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
23 Mar 158976.3DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcin Kromer (VIAF: 44288262)
Bishop Marcin Kromer (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBieczu
Ordained BishopDominican, Church, Warszawa

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 327
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1579, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast