Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jost (Jodok) Knab

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1593BornLucerne
13 Jun 161522.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Switzerland
Sep 1652³59.3AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Switzerland
16 Dec 165259.6AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
Apr 1653³59.9ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Switzerland
15 Feb 165460.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
4 Oct 165865.4DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jost (Jodok) Knab (VIAF: 314889516)
Bishop Jost (Jodok) Knab (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 6
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016