Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Lubodzieski

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Nov 1551AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
16 Oct 1552Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
24 Mar 1562DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Lubodzieski
Bishop Jan Lubodzieski (died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHeilsberg

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 182
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1552, Number 12
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Number 6,362

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 12 Oct 2020

Quantcast