Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwig Hatteisen, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany

Titular Bishop of Anemurium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1696Born
171417.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Dec 171923.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Oct 172125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Oct 175862.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
2 Oct 175862.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Anemurium
7 Jan 175962.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anemurium
3 Apr 177174.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Hatteisen
Bishop Ludwig Hatteisen O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrakel

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,482
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 83, and Page 452
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast