Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Kasimir Johann Baptist Cardinal von Häffelin

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1737BornMinfeld
24 Sep 176326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
28 Sep 178750.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta
11 Nov 178750.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta
6 Apr 181881.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
6 Apr 181881.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Apr 182285.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
27 Aug 182790.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

MicroData Summary for Kasimir Johann Baptist von Häffelin:
Kasimir Johann Baptist Cardinal von Häffelin (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
  • a cardinal for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015