Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Philippe de Groslée

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1504¹Born
28 Apr 151612.3AppointedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
5 Feb 152824.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
21 Dec 155955.9DiedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Philippe de Groslée
Archbishop Jean-Philippe de Groslée (born 1504, died ) Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBologna, Diocese of Bologna, Italy

  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1528, Number 5
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,577

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast