Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Gazino, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jan 1528AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
2 Jul 1529Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
20 May 1557³DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Gazino
Bishop Pietro Gazino C.R.L. (died ) Bishop of Aosta

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPalais des Papes (Sistine), Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1529, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast