Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrogio Gozzeo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Stagno (Ston)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569¹Born
15 Jun 160940.4AppointedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
5 Jul 160940.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
23 Mar 161546.2AppointedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
13 Jul 163263.5DiedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Gozzeo:
Bishop Ambrogio Gozzeo O.P. (died ) Bishop of Stagno (Ston)

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 230
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Feb 2015