Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabiano Giustiniano Giustiniani, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1578Born
11 Jan 159718.3ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
14 May 160627.6Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
13 Jun 161637.7AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
19 Jun 161637.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
3 Jan 1627³48.2DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabiano Giustiniano Giustiniani (VIAF: 20531496)
Bishop Fabiano Giustiniano Giustiniani C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerraferma, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAjaccio, Diocese of Ajaccio

  • a priest for 20.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 68
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 16
  • b/c2: CB, 22 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 May 2017