Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baldassarre Giustiniani

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Feb 1572AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
13 Apr 1572Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
13 Mar 1584DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Baldassarre Giustiniani
Bishop Baldassarre Giustiniani (died ) Bishop of Venosa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 330
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 19, Number 75
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast