Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Ferro, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Terni, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1567AppointedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
5 Oct 1567Ordained BishopBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
10 May 1570AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
Jan 1581³DiedBishop of Terni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Ferro
Bishop Bartolomeo Ferro O.P. (died Jan 1581) Bishop of Terni

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Marie in Aquiro, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 213, and Page 227
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 12, Number 33
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast