Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Ercolani (Herculani), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Perugia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1517¹Born
14 Dec 156952.9AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
8 Jan 157053.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sarno, Italy
9 Feb 157356.1AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
27 Nov 157962.9AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
29 Oct 158669.8DiedBishop of Perugia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Ercolani (Herculani) (VIAF: 90104475)
Archbishop Vincenzo Ercolani (Herculani) O.P. (born 1517, died ) Bishop of Perugia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 272, and Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 213
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 16, Number 57
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast