Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cayetano Gil Taboada

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1688BornSan Esteban de Barcia
26 Sep 173547.1AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
4 Dec 173547.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
23 Aug 174557.0AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
30 Sep 174557.1InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
10 Mar 175162.6DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Cayetano Gil Taboada:
Archbishop Cayetano Gil Taboada (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 53, Number 232
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 176, and Page 266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013