Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Antonio Gigli, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Muro Lucano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1772BornGrottole
21 Mar 183259.9SelectedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
2 Jul 183260.2ConfirmedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
8 Jul 183260.2Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
22 Apr 185886.0ResignedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
22 Jul 186593.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Muro Lucano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Antonio Gigli (VIAF: 88867172)
Bishop Tommaso Antonio Gigli O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Muro Lucano

  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1846
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 273
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Jul 2016