Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philippe du Bec

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1519¹Born
17 Apr 155940.2AppointedBishop of Vannes, France
1566¹47.0ResignedBishop of Vannes, France
6 Sep 156647.6AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
25 Jul 159475.5SelectedArchbishop of Reims, France
7 Jan 159879.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Reims, France
10 Jan 160586.0DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe du Bec
Archbishop Philippe du Bec (born 1519, died ) Archbishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlacePont Audemer, Eure
Death PlaceReims, Archdiocese of Reims

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1559, Number 7*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 329, and Page 253
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 285
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 295

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018