Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Ghislieri

Deceased

Bishop of Strongoli


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Apr 1601AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
13 May 1601Ordained BishopBishop of Strongoli, Italy
2 Oct 1627DiedBishop of Strongoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Ghislieri:
Bishop Sebastiano Ghislieri (died ) Bishop of Strongoli

  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations, Volume 4, Page 323
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 37, Number 189
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 21 Jan 2015