Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Estefan El-Khazen (Gazeno)

Deceased

Archbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1805¹Born
1 Jun 182924.4Ordained PriestPriest
1848²43.0AppointedArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
6 Apr 184843.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
8 Dec 186863.9DiedArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Estefan El-Khazen (Gazeno)
Archbishop Estefan El-Khazen (Gazeno) (born 1805, died ) Archbishop of Damas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: CB, 4 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,727
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast