Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Mendoza

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Nov 1525AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
3 Apr 1527AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
18 Jan 1534AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
29 Mar 1536DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Mendoza:
Bishop Francisco Mendoza (died ) Bishop of Palencia

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 39, Number 187
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 339, and Page 267
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 17 Nov 2013