Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de La Mouche

Deceased

Bishop of Avranches


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Aug 1317AppointedBishop of Avranches, France
13 Nov 1317Ordained BishopBishop of Avranches, France
13 Mar 1327DiedBishop of Avranches, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de La Mouche:
Bishop Jean de La Mouche (died ) Bishop of Avranches

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 66
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,825

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013