Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Maidstone

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Oct 1313AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
7 Oct 1313Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
28 Mar 1317DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Walter Maidstone:
Bishop Walter Maidstone (died ) Bishop of Worcester

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 529
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 71
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013