Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Philipp Anton von Frankenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1695Born
22 Sep 173641.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
26 Sep 174651.4SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
19 Dec 174651.7ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
25 Jul 174752.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
3 Jun 175358.1DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Philipp Anton von Frankenstein
Bishop Johann Philipp Anton von Frankenstein (born , died ) Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForchheim

  • a priest for 16.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast