Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Agnello Fragianni

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi Risorta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1682BornBarletta
1704¹21.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
1705¹22.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 173350.9AppointedBishop of Venafro, Italy
17 May 173350.9Ordained BishopBishop of Venafro, Italy
28 Feb 174259.7AppointedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
Apr 1756³73.8DiedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Agnello Fragianni:
Bishop Francesco Agnello Fragianni (born , died Apr 1756) Bishop of Calvi Risorta

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1752
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 141, and Page 434
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015