Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Grandison

Deceased

Bishop of Exeter, England


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Aug 1327AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
18 Oct 1327Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
16 Jul 1369DiedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Grandison:
Bishop John Grandison (died ) Bishop of Exeter

  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 243
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 73
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013