Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Ziegler von Ziegelberg

Deceased

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1471¹Born
6 Jun 150534.4AppointedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
1507¹36.0Ordained PriestPriest
Oct 1517³46.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
25 Aug 154170.6DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Ziegler von Ziegelberg (VIAF: 57426904)
Bishop Paul Ziegler von Ziegelberg (born 1471, died ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChur, Diocese of Chur
Ordained BishopChur, Diocese of Chur

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 183
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,553
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1517, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast