Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Bernardo da Fonseca Monís

Deceased

Bishop of Porto, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1789Born
18 Mar 182031.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 184354.3SelectedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
22 Jan 184454.8ConfirmedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
16 Jun 184455.2Ordained BishopBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
30 Mar 185465.0SelectedBishop of Porto, Portugal
23 Jun 185465.2ConfirmedBishop of Porto, Portugal
4 Dec 185970.7DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Bernardo da Fonseca Monís
Bishop António Bernardo da Fonseca Monís (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoncorvo

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 465
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 304
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast