Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo Ramón Fernández Angulo

Deceased

Bishop of Tui, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1736Born
13 Mar 177538.8AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
7 May 177538.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
2 Oct 179660.3DiedBishop of Tui, Spain

MicroData Summary for Domingo Ramón Fernández Angulo
Bishop Domingo Ramón Fernández Angulo (born , died ) Bishop of Tui

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFonseca

  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 91, Number 469
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 13
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast