Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulrich von Federspiel

Deceased

Bishop of Chur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1657BornDomat
14 Mar 168224.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Chur, Switzerland
28 Mar 168224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
28 Apr 169234.9SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
1 Dec 169235.5ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
1 Mar 169335.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
11 Oct 172871.4DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Ulrich von Federspiel:
Bishop Ulrich von Federspiel (born , died ) Bishop of Chur

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 178
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015