Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Eustachio, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Larino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1575BornSan Bartolomeo sul Volturno
27 Mar 159924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
9 Jan 161236.8AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
15 Jan 161236.9Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
10 Nov 161641.7ResignedBishop of Larino, Italy
1 Jan 164165.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Tommaso Eustachio:
Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Eustachio C.O. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Larino

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,379
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 215
  • bp/bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013