Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Acsády

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1680¹BornVeszprem
6 Mar 170525.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Mar 170525.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 172545.6SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
8 Apr 172646.2ConfirmedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
26 May 172646.4Ordained BishopBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
10 Oct 174464.7DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adam Acsády:
Bishop Adam Acsády (born 1680, died ) Bishop of Veszprém

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 413
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015