Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Konaider

Deceased

Bishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1736Born
15 Jan 176326.1Ordained PriestPriest
1787¹50.1AppointedBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
30 Sep 178750.8Ordained BishopBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
15 Jun 180265.5DiedBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Konaider
Bishop Gabriel Konaider (born , died ) Bishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,787, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast