Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Gemayel

Deceased

Bishop of Cipro (Maronite)

Note/Previous Titular See: confirmation after death


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1740¹BornBikfaya
1767²27.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
1767²27.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
Dec 1767³27.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra
1786²46.0SucceededBishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
14 Jun 179555.4SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
12 Apr 179656.2DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
27 Jun 179656.4ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Philippe Gemayel:
Bishop Philippe Gemayel (born 1740, died ) Bishop of Cipro

  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,919
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015