Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Esteban Muniera, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cefal¨


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1568¹BornAlcaraz
29 Mar 162153.2AppointedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
2 Apr 162153.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
14 Oct 163163.7DiedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Esteban Muniera:
Bishop Manuel Esteban Muniera O. de M. (died ) Bishop of Cefal¨

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 146
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 70, Number 411
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 139, Number 889

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015