Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Osorio de Escobar y Llamas (Mendoza)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Aug 1655AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
25 Jul 1656Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
1664¹ResignedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
14 Oct 1673DiedBishop Emeritus of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Osorio de Escobar y Llamas (Mendoza):
Bishop Diego Osorio de Escobar y Llamas (Mendoza) (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 17.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 186, Number 1,161
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 338
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015