Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Schachner

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1447¹Born
147124.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 149043.1SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
26 Jun 149043.4ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
3 Jan 150053.0DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christoph Schachner (VIAF: 20752059)
Bishop Christoph Schachner (born 1447, died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRied

  • a priest for 29.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 213
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1490, Number 18*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast