Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni (Giulio) della Torre

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1549¹Born
25 Sep 158940.7AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
10 Nov 159546.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
10 Jun 160657.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
Jan 1623²74.0DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni (Giulio) della Torre
Bishop Giovanni (Giulio) della Torre (born 1549, died Jan 1623) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy

Source(s):
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 289
  • b: Treccani.it, 15 Oct 2016
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 328
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1589, Number 18*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast