Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Flugi d’Apremont

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550¹Born
1575¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 160151.2AppointedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
22 Jul 160151.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
24 Aug 162777.6ResignedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
30 Aug 162777.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Flugi d’Apremont
Bishop Johann Flugi d’Apremont (born 1550, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSankt Moritz
Ordained BishopLucerne

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 183
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 170
  • ob/c2+: CB, 1 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,567
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,601, Number 21
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 586

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast