Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Boivin de Péricard

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Avranches

Titular Bishop of Tarsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588¹BornRouen
3 Aug 161628.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Avranches, France
3 Aug 161628.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tarsus
28 May 161729.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarsus
12 Feb 163648.1DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Avranches, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri Boivin de Péricard:
Bishop Henri Boivin de Péricard (died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Avranches

  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 65, and Page 328
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015