Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Maria dei Monti Sanfelice, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1731³BornNapoli
4 Jun 175422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 May 176836.8AppointedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
22 May 176836.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
23 Mar 180674.7DiedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Maria dei Monti Sanfelice:
Bishop Benedetto Maria dei Monti Sanfelice O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1791
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 315
  • c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014