Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Del Monte

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jul 1616AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
24 Jul 1616Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
14 Jun 1628DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Del Monte
Bishop Alessandro Del Monte (died ) Bishop of Gubbio

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 183
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 61, Number 350
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast