Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuliano de’ Medici

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jun 1620AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
21 Jun 1620Ordained BishopArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
6 Jan 1635DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuliano de’ Medici:
Archbishop Giuliano de’ Medici (died ) Archbishop of Pisa

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 280
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 68, Number 400
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1620, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015