Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude de la Magdelaine

Deceased

Bishop of Autun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591²BornCharolles
18 May 162029.3AppointedBishop of Autun, France
21 Sep 162130.7Ordained BishopBishop of Autun, France
21 Apr 165261.3DiedBishop of Autun, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude de la Magdelaine:
Bishop Claude de la Magdelaine (died ) Bishop of Autun

  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 70
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1621, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 18 Feb 2015