Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philibert du Sault

Deceased

Bishop of Acqs (Dax)


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jul 1618AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Acqs (Dax), France
23 Jul 1618AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
14 May 1623Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
25 May 1623SucceededBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
11 Nov 1638DiedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France

MicroData Summary for Philibert du Sault:
Bishop Philibert du Sault (died ) Bishop of Acqs (Dax)

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 89, and Page 103
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 23 Feb 2015