Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Deza y Ulloa

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1660¹BornHuejotzingo
17 Dec 171656.9AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
3 Jul 171858.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
22 Apr 172262.3DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Deza y Ulloa:
Bishop Francisco de Deza y Ulloa (born 1660, died ) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 215
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,470
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015