Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mateo Panduro y Villafaña, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1646³BornValderas
18 Jun 169649.7AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
30 Sep 169953.0Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
1 Oct 171468.0AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
21 Mar 172275.4DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mateo Panduro y Villafaña:
Bishop Mateo Panduro y Villafaña O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of La Paz

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 302, and Page 320
  • bd/ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,410
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 242, Number 1,498
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015