Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Devoti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Anagni

Titular Archbishop of Cartagine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1744BornRoma
30 Mar 178944.7AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
14 Apr 178944.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Apr 178944.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 178944.8Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
26 Mar 180459.7ResignedBishop of Anagni, Italy
26 Mar 180459.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Zela
29 May 180459.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
18 Sep 182076.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Anagni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Devoti:
Archbishop Giovanni Devoti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Anagni

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 81
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 402, and Page 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013