Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brande Castiglioni

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1415²Born
8 Oct 146651.7AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
19 Oct 146651.7Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
16 Jul 148772.5DiedBishop of Como, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Brande Castiglioni
Bishop Brande Castiglioni (born 1415, died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 140
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,485
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1466, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast