Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amauri d’Acigné

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Mar 1462AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
11 Apr 1462Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
23 Feb 1477DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Amauri d’Acigné
Bishop Amauri d’Acigné (died ) Bishop of Nantes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHai-Mahéas
Ordained BishopSaint-Apollinaire, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 198
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1462, Number 1
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast